CA AB3073 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9100 of, and to add Sections 9301 and 9551 to, the Civil Code, to amend Sections 1720, 1721, 1722, and 1773.2 of the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 4103, 4104, and 4104.5 of, to add Sections 2504, 4102, 4115, 4116, and 4117 to, and to repeal and add Section 4113 of, the Public Contract Code, relating to investor-owned utilities.
Title
Investor-owned utilities: contracting.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and U. & E. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 9100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 9301 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 9551 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1720 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1721 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1722 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1773.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 90.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 2504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 4102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 4103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 4104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 4104.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 4115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 4116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 4117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3073 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3073 |