CA AB3067 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22580 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to the Internet.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internet: marketing: minors: cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3067 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 3067 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 347, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5277.).
2018-07-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5129.)
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2018-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-04-26AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and P. & C.P.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22580Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback