CA AB306 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3011 and 3017 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vote by mail ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 306 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB306 Gonzalez Fletcher By Hertzberg (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - AB 306 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - AB 306 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading Amend By HARPER Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 48 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 203, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6204.).
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5169.).
2018-06-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-16SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 15).
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-01-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 3. Page 3798.)
2018-01-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-11AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-01-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (January 10).
2018-01-04AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-01-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2017-02-07AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback