CA AB3052 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 16418 of the Government Code, relating to housing, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Fund for Economic Uncertainties: rental housing: elderly persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1431Amended CodeCitation Text
Code of Civil Procedure1444.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code16418Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback