CA AB3051 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 5.3 (commencing with Section 18750) of Chapter 3 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Personal income taxes: voluntary contributions: California K–12 Climate Change Education Voluntary Tax Contribution Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18750 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |