CA AB3039 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-02 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 25299.51, 25299.100, 25299.101, 25299.102, 25299.103, 25299.104, 25299.105, 25299.106, 25299.107, and 25299.117 of, and to add Sections 25299.112, 25299.113, 25299.113.1, and 25299.113.2 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous substances.
Title
Underground storage tanks: small business loan and grant program.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3039 Quirk Assembly Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4756.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25299.100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.113.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.113.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25299.51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |