CA AB3038 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38000 of the Education Code, relating to school safety.
Title
School safety: armed school resource officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 38000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |