CA AB3032 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1192.7, 2933.3, and 4019.2 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: child neglect: serious felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1192.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2933.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4019.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |