CA AB3021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 16 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27552 and 27554 of, and to add Division 8.5 (commencing with Section 16200) to, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to farm animals, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farm animals: egg-laying hens: confinement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3021 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and PUB. S.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 5543.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 25).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code16200New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code27552Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code27554Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback