CA AB302 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8103 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to deadly weapons.
Title
Deadly weapons: prohibited persons: reports.
Sponsors
Sen. Elaine Alquist [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] |
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-20 - Assembly - AB 302 BEALL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB302 Beall By Alquist (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 302 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB302 Beall By Alquist (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Assembly - AB 302 BEALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-03 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-20 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6417.) | |
2010-08-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4573.) | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-06-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). | |
2010-06-03 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-14 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2009-06-22 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |
2009-06-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2058.) | |
2009-06-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). | |
2009-04-01 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-03-25 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 24). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2009-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |