CA AB30 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 221.2) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to schools.
Title
School or athletic team names: California Racial Mascots
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Sen. Marty Block [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 30 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB30 Alejo By Block (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 30 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB30 Alejo By Block (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Assembly - AB 30 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 10. Page 3048.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.) |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2595.). |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27). |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 9. Page 1259.) |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 29). |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2014-12-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 221.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |