CA AB3 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27510, 29182, and 30300 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: age restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 3 BONTA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-07-02SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-09-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-09-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-09-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2017-09-14SenateSenate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2895.)
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2062.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-02-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (February 14).
2017-02-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (February 7). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2017-01-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S.
2016-12-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
2016-12-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1210.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code27510Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code29182Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code30300Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code4024.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code490.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code490.55New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code786.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code853.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code978.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code13500New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback