CA AB297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 46392 of the Education Code, relating to education finance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Emergency average daily attendance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 46392 | Amended Code | Citation Text |