CA AB297 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11105 of, and to add Section 11105.06 to, the Penal Code, relating to criminal history information.
Title
Criminal history information: law enforcement employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-29 - Senate - Special Consent #11 AB297 Solorio (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 297 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-04 - Assembly - AB 297 SOLORIO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-06-29 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1520.) | |
2009-06-25 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-24 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-09 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-05-04 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-04 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1239.) | |
2009-04-27 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-23 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 22). | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11105.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |