CA AB296 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 73.2 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
Task force: health of women veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 296 CERVANTES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB296 Cervantes et al. By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 296 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB296 Cervantes et al. By Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 296 CERVANTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Stricken from file. | |
2018-01-03 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3128.). |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2580.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1925.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and V.A. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 68530 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 73.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |