CA AB2943 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Low.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Low.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1761 and 1770 of the Civil Code, relating to unlawful business practices.
Title
Unlawful business practices: sexual orientation change efforts.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Sen. Susan Eggman [D] |
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Todd Gloria [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2943 Low et al. By Wiener (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2943 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - ? (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Assembly - AB 2943 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - ? (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Low. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5339.). |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 4783.) |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 10). |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1761 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1770 | Amended Code | Citation Text |