CA AB293 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 514, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 7737 of, and to add Sections 7737.1 and 7737.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1520 and 1560 of, and to add Section 1518.5 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to funeral law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preneed funeral arrangements: unclaimed property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-03 - Senate - Special Consent AB293 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 293 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 514, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-05 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-03-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-01-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & P.
2021-01-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 21.
2021-01-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7737New CodeSee Bill Text
Code of Civil Procedure1520New CodeSee Bill Text
Code of Civil Procedure1560New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback