CA AB2922 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 12335) to Chapter 4 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to add Sections 12209.60, 17053.60, and 23660 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to community development, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Community Development Tax Credit Program: community development corporations: allocations: income taxation: credits.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12335 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12209.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23660 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2922 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB2922 |