CA AB292 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 185034.3 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to high-speed rail, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
High-speed rail: agricultural lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Agriculture (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 292 GALGIANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-15 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Agriculture (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Assembly - AB 292 GALGIANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-28 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-08-30 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cannella. | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-08-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-08-15 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-07-11 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-07 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | |
2011-06-16 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and AGRI. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 1791.) | |
2011-05-31 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-27 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-26 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-08 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-09 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |
2011-02-08 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 29043 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 185034.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |