CA AB2913 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 18938.5 of, and to add Section 18938.6 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to building permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building standards: building permits: expiration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2913 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2913 Wood By Wiener (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2913 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-06SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-22SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-21AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5252.)
2018-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code18938.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code18938.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback