CA AB2913 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 23355.3, 23502, 23504, 23506, 23508, 25503.6, and 25503.8 of, and to add Section 23771.5 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: licensees: craft distillers: tied-house restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2913 G.O. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By GRAY (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2913 Committee On G.O. (Gray) By Hall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2913 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2913 Committee On G.O. (Gray) By Hall (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2913 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 423, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6467.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5369.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hall. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4791.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 17. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23355.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23508 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23771.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 25503.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |