CA AB291 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 489, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 489, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6103.7 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 1940.2, 1940.3, and 1942.5 of, and to add Sections 1940.05, 1940.35, and 3339.10 to, the Civil Code, and to add Section 1161.4 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to housing.
Title
Housing: immigration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 291 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB291 Chiu et al. By Lara (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 291 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB291 Chiu et al. By Lara (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - AB 291 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 489, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 3103.). |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2496.). |
2017-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1655.) |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 2). |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 21). |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and P. & C.P. |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6103.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1161.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1940.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1940.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1940.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1940.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1942.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 3339.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |