CA AB290 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal and amend Section 7500.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to collateral recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collateral recovery: repossession agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-05 - Assembly - AB 290 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB290 Salas et al. By Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 290 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 271, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2017-09-05AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2917.).
2017-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2338.).
2017-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-12SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1389.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-28AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-17AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-02-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-02-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
2017-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7500.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback