CA AB29 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 791, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 791, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 54237.8 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 253.1 of, and to add and repeal Section 253.9 of, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways.
Title
State Highway Route 710.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB29 Holden et al. By Leyva (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Assembly - AB 29 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB29 Holden et al. By Leyva (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 29 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-14 - Assembly - AB 29 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB29 Holden et al. By Leyva (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 29 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 791, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 6. Page 3614.). |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3614.) |
2019-09-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 2958.). |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 2007.) |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1775.) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1615.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 10). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54237.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 253.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 253.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |