CA AB29 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 11.10 (commencing with Section 1399.880) to Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to pharmacy benefit managers.
Title
Pharmacy benefit managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (May 9). |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1399.880 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 152000 | New Code | See Bill Text |