CA AB2891 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 76004 of the Education Code, relating to high school and community college dual enrollment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High school and community college dual enrollment: College and Career Access Pathways partnerships: charter schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code76004Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback