CA AB2888 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 863, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 863, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1203.065 of the Penal Code, relating to probation.
Title
Sex crimes: mandatory prison sentence.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2888 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2888 Low By Beall (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2888 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2888 Low By Beall (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2888 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 863, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6336.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5026.). |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4688.) |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 4401.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |