CA AB2885 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11629.77 of, to repeal Section 11629.83 of, and to repeal and add Section 11629.79 of, the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: low-cost automobile insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 2885 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 2885 INS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Roth. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4360.) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 11629.77 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 11629.79 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 11629.83 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |