CA AB288 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 76038 to the Education Code, relating to community college districts.
Title
Public postsecondary education: community colleges:
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-07 - Assembly - AB 288 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB288 Fong By Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 288 FONG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB288 Fong By Hancock (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-27 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Assembly - AB 288 FONG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-08 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-07 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2964.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2977.). | |
2011-09-06 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-09-06 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2308.). | |
2011-08-30 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25). | |
2011-06-27 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-15 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-14 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 8). | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-04-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-14 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 982.) | |
2011-04-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 6). | |
2011-03-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-22 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 15). | |
2011-03-09 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-03-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-02-09 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |
2011-02-08 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76038 | New Code | See Bill Text |