CA AB2878 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on unfinished business file, concurrence pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on unfinished business file, concurrence pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6001, 6008.6, 6011, 6013.1, 6013.3, 6013.5, 6015, 6016, 6019, 6021, 6022, 6026.7, 6029, 6030, 6060.2, 6060.25, 6086.5, 6140, and 6145 of, to add Sections 6134 and 6140.56 to, to add and repeal Section 6075.6 of, and to repeal Sections 6008.5, 6009.7, 6012, 6013.2, 6018, and 6026.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to the State Bar.
Title
Attorneys: State Bar: board of trustees.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB2878 Committee on JUD. By Jackson (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2878 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2878 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 10 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2878 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2878 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 10 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on unfinished business file, concurrence pending. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3 (b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5583.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5586.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5599.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 5168.) Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 5168.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5168.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5205.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5205.) |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 10. Noes 50. Page 5008.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mark Stone. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4944.) |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |