CA AB286 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 26019 to the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 34011 and 34012 of, and to add Section 34017.5 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-04-09AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyIn committee: Hearing for testimony only.
2019-02-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and B. & P.
2019-01-29AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
2019-01-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26019New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34011Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34012Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code34017.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback