CA AB2851 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-31 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-08-31 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25150.84 of, and to add Sections 25150.87 and 41514.6 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Metal shredding facilities: fence-line air quality monitoring.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2851 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2851 Bonta By Laird (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2851 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2851 Bonta By Laird (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2851 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12.). |
2024-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7.). |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-27 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 9.) |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 15). |
2024-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 13.) |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2024-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25150.84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25150.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 41514.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |