CA AB2844 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2010 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2844 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2844 Bloom By Block (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2844 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2844 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading Motion to Suspend the Rules By ALLEN (Y: 26 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2844 Bloom By Block (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2844 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2844 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading Motion to Suspend the Rules By ALLEN (Y: 26 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 6445.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 5367.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 11). In committee: Reconsideration of a favorable vote granted. From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 5212.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 108115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116385 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 2010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 2100 | New Code | See Bill Text |