CA AB283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11265.8 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 11253.5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs: school attendance: immunizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 283 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB283 Chu By Portantino (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 283 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 3479.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2821.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 2112.)
2019-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-03-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-02-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-01-29AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
2019-01-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11253.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11265.8Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback