CA AB283 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 84751.3 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Community colleges: property tax revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 84751.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |