CA AB2821 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18991.4 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health and human services.
Title
Integrated and comprehensive health and human services system.
Sponsors
Asm. Chad Mayes [I] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2821 MAYES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2821 Mayes By Roth (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2821 MAYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2821 Mayes By Roth (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2821 MAYES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 325, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6376.). |
2018-08-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5270.). |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5306.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12301.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18991.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |