CA AB2821 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 14.2 (commencing with Section 53590) to Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing for a Healthy California Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2821 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2821 Chiu By Hernandez (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2821 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2821 Chiu By Hernandez (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Transportation and Housing (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2821 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 16. Page 6348.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5290.). |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and T. & H. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 5201.) |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (May 27). |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (April 19). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HEALTH. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50678 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53570 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53590 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14000.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |