CA AB282 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 401 of the Penal Code, relating to suicide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aiding, advising, or encouraging suicide: exemption from prosecution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - AB 282 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB282 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Monning (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - AB 282 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 245, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-20AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 6348.).
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 5169.).
2018-05-16SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 15).
2018-03-15SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-01-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 17. Page 3797.)
2018-01-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 9).
2018-01-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-01-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-14AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-02-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
2017-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13519.45New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code401Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback