CA AB2815 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 553, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 553, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3025.7 to the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: vote by mail ballot drop-off locations.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Berman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2815 Berman By Limón (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2815 Berman Assembly Third Reading By LOW (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2815 Berman Assembly Third Reading By LOW (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 553, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5138.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 4872.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 3025.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |