CA AB2805 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Sections 4181.2, 4653, and 4654 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 3003.1, 3004.5, 3005.5, 3031.2, 3950, 3953, 4150, 4181, 4181.1, 4188, 4304, 4650, 4652, 4655, and 4657 of, to add Section 4654.1 to, to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 3965) to Part 3 of Division 4 of, and to repeal, add, and repeal Section 4651 of, the Fish and Game Code, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 10791) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 5 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to wild pigs.
Title
Wild pigs: validations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2805 BIGELOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2805 BIGELOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5531.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 10791 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3003.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3004.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3005.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3031.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3950 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3953 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4150 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4181 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4181.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4181.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4188 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4650 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4651 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4652 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4653 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4654 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4655 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 4657 | New Code | See Bill Text |