CA AB2805 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and repeal Sections 4181.2, 4653, and 4654 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 3003.1, 3004.5, 3005.5, 3031.2, 3950, 3953, 4150, 4181, 4181.1, 4188, 4304, 4650, 4652, 4655, and 4657 of, to add Section 4654.1 to, to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 3965) to Part 3 of Division 4 of, and to repeal, add, and repeal Section 4651 of, the Fish and Game Code, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 10791) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 5 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to wild pigs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wild pigs: validations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 2805 BIGELOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-27SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5531.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code10791New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code3003.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code3004.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code3005.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code3031.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code3950New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code3953New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4150New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4181New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4181.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4181.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code4188New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4304New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4650New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4651New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4652New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4653Repealed CodeCitation Text
Fish and Game Code4654New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4655New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code4657New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback