CA AB28 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 820.1 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Department of Transportation: environmental review process: federal pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. Catharine Baker [R] |
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 28 FRAZIER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB28 Frazier et al. By Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - AB 28 FRAZIER Third Reading Urgency (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB28 Frazier et al. By Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - AB 28 FRAZIER Third Reading Urgency (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-03-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 644.). |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 378.). |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (February 28). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 312.). |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 8). |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD. |
2016-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 820.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |