CA AB2799 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 22.2.5 (commencing with Section 22586) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: personal information: preschool and prekindergarten purposes.
Sponsors
Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2799 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2799 Chau By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2799 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2799 Chau By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2799 CHAU Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 620, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6347.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5300.). |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4791.) |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and ED. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22586 | New Code | See Bill Text |