CA AB2789 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 688 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Health care practitioners: prescriptions: electronic data transmission.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2789 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2789 Wood By Hill (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2789 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2789 Wood By Hill (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - AB 2789 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 438, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 6639.). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5515.). |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 18). |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 2. Page 4938.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 25). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 688 | New Code | See Bill Text |