CA AB2787 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 70022 and 70023 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Student financial aid: Middle Class Scholarship Program: private nonprofit postsecondary educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 70023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |