CA AB2780 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53398.54 of the Government Code, relating to redevelopment.
Title
Dissolution of redevelopment agencies: enhanced infrastructure financing districts: City of Selma.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2780 Arambula By Hurtado (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2780 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2780 Arambula By Hurtado (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2780 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2780 Arambula Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2780 Arambula By Hurtado (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2780 Arambula Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 14.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 5233.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 11. Page 4656.) |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 4). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |