CA AB278 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 571, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 571, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14306.5 and 17003 of the Public Resources Code, relating to resource conservation.
Title
California Conservation Corps: community conservation corps: applicant selection: parolees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 278 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB278 McCarty et al. By Durazo (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 278 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB278 McCarty et al. By Durazo (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 278 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 571, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3165.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 3. Page 2514.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1792.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14306.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 17003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |