CA AB2772 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.6 (commencing with Section 1212) to Title 8 of Part 2 of the Penal Code, relating to drug treatment.
Title
Drug treatment programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1212 | New Code | See Bill Text |