CA AB2771 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 70.5 (commencing with Section 101300) to Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to education finance, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election for the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education finance: Higher Education Facilities Bond Act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2771 EGGMAN Third Reading Urgency (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-05SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 27).
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 5626.).
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25).
2018-05-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code101300New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback