CA AB2760 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10.7 (commencing with Section 740) to Chapter 1 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Prescription drugs: prescribers: naloxone hydrochloride and other FDA-approved drugs.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-23 - Assembly - AB 2760 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2760 Wood By Hernandez (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2760 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2760 Wood By Hernandez (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2760 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6501.). |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5456.). |
2018-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5254.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 740 | New Code | See Bill Text |